Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3551738

EP3551738 - SYNTHETIC DETERGENT BARS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
A Company Registered In England And Wales
Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[2019/42]
Inventor(s)01 / FARRELL, Terence, James
Unilever Home&Personal Care USA
40 Merritt Boulevard
Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US
 [2019/42]
Representative(s)Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[2019/42]
Application number, filing date17801745.528.11.2017
[2019/42]
WO2017EP80734
Priority number, dateEP2016020253806.12.2016         Original published format: EP 16202538
[2019/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018104115
Date:14.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3551738
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018
[2019/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/00, C11D3/34, C11D3/37, C11D10/04, C11D17/00
[2019/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYNTHETISCHER WASCHMITTELRIEGEL[2019/42]
English:SYNTHETIC DETERGENT BARS[2019/42]
French:BARRES DE DÉTERGENT SYNTHÉTIQUE[2019/42]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2019National basic fee paid 
22.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/42]
22.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US3951842  (PRINCE LEON M, et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 6, line 4 - line 38 * * column 11, line 25 - line 55; example 3; compound With Linoleic Acid Dimer *;
 [IY]US6057275  (FAIR MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * column 1, line 9 - line 18 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 18 * * column 6, line 19 - line 34 * * column 6, line 35 - line 42 * * column 10; example 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-13;
 [A]WO9512382  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 19, line 20 - line l; example 20 *;
 [A]WO9937744  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 44, line 23 - line l * * page 46, line 11 - line l; table 2; compounds F2-F5 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5540854  (FAIR MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 6 - line 17 * * column 5, line 25 - line 47; examples 1-4 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 12 *
by applicantUS5520840
 US3376229
 US5683973
 US5786312
 US5795852
 WO9512382