EP3467677 - IMAGE SCREENING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUO, Tao c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Petit, Maxime, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 17801940.2 | 23.02.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017CN74585 | Priority number, date | CN201610346355 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610346355 | [2019/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202086 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467677 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/583, G06F16/53, G06F16/54 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
G06F16/53 (EP);
G06F16/51 (CN);
G06F16/54 (EP,CN);
G06F16/583 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | BILD-SCREENING-VERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2019/15] | English: | IMAGE SCREENING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'IMAGES | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2018 | Translation filed | 27.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016042253 (SAWHNEY HARPREET SINGH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0031] , [0033] , [0039] , [0056] , [0065] - [0067] - [0070] - [0072]; figures 56A-6D * [I] 5-8,13,14; | [I]CN103838484 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0016] , [0023] , [0026] , [0043] , [0054] - [0055]; figure 2 *; | [A] - Wendy S Yambor, "ANALYSIS OF PCA-BASED AND FISHER DISCRIMINANT-BASED IMAGE RECOGNITION ALGORITHMS", Computer Science Technical Report, (20000731), URL: http://www.face-rec.org/interesting-papers/general/tr_00-103.pdf, (20191105), XP055638891 [A] 2-4,10-12 * abstract * * chapter 1.2; page 2 - page 3 * * chapter 1.4; page 4 * * page 5 * * chapter 4.3; page 32 - page 34 * | International search | [XY]CN103838484 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD) [X] 1, 5-9, 13-14 * , description, paragraphs [0038]-[0075], description, paragraphs [0038]-[0075] * [Y] 2-4, 10-12; | [Y]CN104133917 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 2-4, 10-12 * , description, paragraphs [0066]-[0072] *; | [Y]CN105260385 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMM CO LTD) [Y] 3, 4, 11, 12 * , description, paragraphs [0058]-[0072] *; | [A]CN104991959 (BEIJING JINGDONG SHANGKE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103558996 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2005105803 (RAY LAWRENCE A [US]) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document * |