Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467045

EP3467045 - PLANT MIX WARM REGENERATED ASPHALT MIXTURE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jiangsu Tiannuo Road Materials Technology Co., Ltd
Ganghan Road
Dagang Street
New District
Zhenjiang, Jiangsu 212028 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Zhaomin
Ganghan Road
Dagang Street
New District
Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212028 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Yuzhen
Ganghan Road
Dagang Street
New District
Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212028 / CN
03 / XIAO, Hubing
Ganghan Road
Dagang Street
New District
Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212028 / CN
04 / XU, Meng
Ganghan Road
Dagang Street
New District
Zhenjiang Jiangsu 212028 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802241.418.07.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN93284
Priority number, dateCN20161034445123.05.2016         Original published format: CN201610344451
CN20161114496113.12.2016         Original published format: CN201611144961
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202395
Date:30.11.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467045
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:C08L95/00, C04B26/26, C04B40/00
[2019/25]
Former International [2019/15]C08L95/00, C04B26/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DURCH WÄRMEMISCHUNG IN EINER ANLAGE REGENERIERTES ALPHALTGEMISCH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/15]
English:PLANT MIX WARM REGENERATED ASPHALT MIXTURE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR[2019/15]
French:MÉLANGE D'ASPHALTE VÉGÉTAL RÉGÉNÉRÉ CONSTITUÉ PAR MALAXAGE À CHAUD ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018Translation filed 
19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Search fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2014129758  (HUH JUNG DO [KR]) [X] 1,2,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN103113044  (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [X] 1,2,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN104773976  (UNIV TONGJI) [X] 1,2,12 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN102112557  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1, 3-8, 12 * , description, particular embodiments, and figures *;
 [PX]CN106009719  (JIANGSU TIANNUO ROAD MAT TECH CO LTD) [PX] 2-4, 9-12 * , description, paragraphs 5-26 *;
 [PX]CN106746926  (JIANGSU TIANNUO ROAD MAT TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1, 3-8, 12 * , description, paragraphs 4-26 *;
 [A]CN104119032  (UNIV TONGJI, et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102795812  (HEYUAN OCEAN POWER TECH CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101654347  (JIANGSU TRANSP RES INST CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102604401  (YINGDA HEAT REGENERATION CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101177535  (HAICHUAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12 * , description, embodiment 1 *;
 [A]WO2013053882  (CECA SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *
 [X]  - MA, TAO et al., "5.4. [Factory mixed heat regeneration mixing key process]", Key Technologies of Hot Central Plant Recycling Asphalt Pavement, (20150531), ISBN 978-7-5641-5444-8, pages 196 - 199, XP009510903 [X] 2-4, 9-12