Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464153

EP3464153 - STRUCTURE OF A ROTATION DEVICE, AND A CORRESPONDING ROTATION DEVICE, AND A FOREST MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ponsse OYJ
Ponssentie 22
74200 Vieremä / FI
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KAATRASALO, Tero
c/o Ponsse Oyj
Ponssentie 22
74200 Vieremä / FI
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Helke, Kimmo Kalervo
Kespat Oy
Vasarakatu 1
40320 Jyväskylä / FI
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802263.826.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FI50397
Priority number, dateFI2016000543725.05.2016         Original published format: FI 20165437
[2019/15]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203107
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464153
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B66C3/00, H01R13/00, E02F3/36, A01G23/083
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR EINER DREHVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE DREHVORRICHTUNG SOWIE FORSTMASCHINE[2019/15]
English:STRUCTURE OF A ROTATION DEVICE, AND A CORRESPONDING ROTATION DEVICE, AND A FOREST MACHINE[2019/15]
French:STRUCTURE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE ROTATION, DISPOSITIF DE ROTATION CORRESPONDANT, ET MACHINE FORESTIÈRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5632625  (FAUST HEIN-PETER [CA) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document; especially claims 1-3; figures 1, 2 *;
 [Y]FR2501823  (ARDENNES EQUIPEMENTS [FR) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 & the whole machine translation into English [online][retrieved 25.8.2017]; especially claims 1, 2 & Abstracts [online] EPOQUENET EPODOC & WPI *;
 [Y]EP2460758  (EPSILON KRAN GMBH [AT) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document; especially figures 1, 6 *