Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464672

EP3464672 - HIGH-PRECISION SHADOW-MASK-DEPOSITION SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emagin Corporation
Building 334
2070 Route 52
Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ANANDAN, Munisamy
6402 Hillside Terrace Drive
Austin Texas 78749 / US
02 / GHOSH, Amalkumar
2070 Route 52 Building 334
Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US
03 / VAZAN, Fridrich
3 Vantage Drive
Pittsford 14534 / UM
04 / DONOGHUE, Evan
2070 Route 52 Building 334
Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US
05 / KHAYRULLIN, Ilyas
2070 Route 52 Building 334
Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US
06 / ALI, Tariq
2070 Route 52 Building 334
Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US
07 / TICE, Kerry
2070 Route 52 Building 334
Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Elisabethenstrasse 11
64283 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PartG mbB
Elisabethenstrasse 11
64283 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date17802312.324.07.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB54481
Priority number, dateUS201662340793P24.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340793 P
US20171559763517.05.2017         Original published format: US201715597635
US20171560293923.05.2017         Original published format: US201715602939
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017203502
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3464672
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/04, C23C14/50, C23C14/54, C23C14/56
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HOCHPRÄZISES SCHATTENMASKENABSCHEIDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/15]
English:HIGH-PRECISION SHADOW-MASK-DEPOSITION SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREFOR[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME DE DÉPÔT HAUTE PRÉCISION PAR MASQUE PERFORÉ ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0008228  (CVC, INC) [Y] 1-55 * , abstract, claims, page 2, lines 1-7, fig. ID *;
 [Y]US6287436  (INNOVENT, INC.) [Y] 1-55 * , col.4, lines 10-25, 50-67, col.5, lines 1-7, claims, fig. 1 *;
 [Y]US2004142108  (MITSURO ATOBE et al.) [Y] 1-55 * , claims, [0010]-[0013], [0054], fig. 1, 2 *;
 [Y]WO0224321  (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [Y] 1-55 * , claims, page 2, lines 11-14, page 7, lines 22-31, page 10, lines 1-7, fig. 1 *;
 [Y]EP2168644  (APPLIED MATERIALS, INC) [Y] 2 * , claims *;
 [Y]RU2155204  (HHCTHTYT ??????? ?????????? ?????? PAH) [Y] 3 * , claims; *;
 [Y]US7615161  (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [Y] 4-6, 40 * , claims, col.6, lines 29-42 *;
 [Y]US2013168231  (INTERMOLECULAR INC.) [Y] 12, 28 * , [0047] *;
 [Y]WO2010113102  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.) [Y] 13, 16, 21-22, 28, 31-34, 49-53 * , claim 6, page 8, lines 10-17, page 1, lines 21-30 *;
 [Y]RU2588921  (???????? C ???????????? ???????????????? ''JIACKOM) [Y] 21-22 * , claims *