Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467301

EP3467301 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd.
2520 Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YONEYA, Naoki
c/o HITACHI, LTD.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / SARUWATARI, Masayuki
c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD.
2520 Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP
03 / ORYOJI, Kazuhiro
c/o HITACHI, LTD.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802400.614.03.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP10053
Priority number, dateJP2016010575327.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016105753
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203798
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467301
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:F02P5/15, F02B11/00, F02D13/02, F02D15/00, F02D15/04, F02D19/06, F02D41/02, F02D41/34, F02D45/00, F02M26/01, F02M26/06, F02P5/153, // F02P5/152
[2020/04]
Former International [2019/15]F02P5/15, F02B11/00, F02D13/02, F02D15/00, F02D15/04, F02D19/06, F02D41/02, F02D41/34, F02D45/00, F02M26/01, F02M26/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERBRENNUNGSMOTORSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE CONTROL DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018Translation filed 
02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1447654  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0023] , [0048] , [0054] , [0098]; figures 5,10,13,14 * [A] 3;
 [XAI]EP1571331  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0108] , [ 113]; figure - * [A] 3 [I] 4-10;
 [XI]US6267100  (TORNO OSKAR [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * sentences 8-52, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 * [I] 4-10;
 [XA]JP2015034474  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] - [0070]; figure - * [A] 12;
 [A]US2007245818  (MATEKUNAS FREDERIC ANTON [US], et al) [A] 1,17,18 * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] *;
 [A]US2013024089  (WANG YUE-YUN [US], et al) [A] 1,17,18 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 67] , [0079] , [0080]; figures 14,15 *;
 [A]US2015114342  (IWAI KOUHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1,13-16 * figure 7 *
International search[A]JP2008231995  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-18 * , abstract; claim 2; paragraphs [0028] to [0029]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH11200934  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-18 * , abstract; paragraphs [0023] to [0025] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010285957  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-18 * , claims 1 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005351145  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-18 * , abstract; claims 1, 3; paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *