Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467763

EP3467763 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Yuki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / NOMURA, Eisuke
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / IWAI, Yoshiaki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / NODA, Takuro
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802417.022.03.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP11541
Priority number, dateJP2016010580827.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016105808
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203815
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467763
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06T1/00, A61B3/113, G02B27/02, G06F3/038
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2019/15]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2018Translation filed 
20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2015086617  (SENSOMOTORIC INSTR GES FÜR INNOVATIVE SENSORIK MBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,14,15 * pages 18-19 * [I] 12,13
International search[XA]JPH08154899  (NIKON CORP) [X] 1, 17-18 * , paragraphs [0040] to [0050] (Family: none) * [A] 2-16;
 [XA]JP2003339642  (CANON KK) [X] 1, 17-18 * , paragraphs [0105] to [0112]; fig. 9 (Family: none) * [A] 2-16;
 [A]WO2013175701  (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , fig. 1 & US 2015/0130714 A1 fig. 1 & JP 2013-244212 A & CN 104302226 A *