Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467361

EP3467361 - VALVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2020New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city
Aichi 448-8661 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SUGAWARA Takehiro
C/O DENSO CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Division
1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
02 / KOZU Takahiro
C/O DENSO CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Division
1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
03 / OSHIMA Tomio
C/O DENSO CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Division
1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802471.712.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP14903
Priority number, dateJP2016010304224.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016103042
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203872
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467361
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/04, F16J15/06, F16J15/10, F16K27/00, F16K27/12, F02M26/72
[2019/18]
Former International [2019/15]F16K31/04, F16J15/06, F16J15/10, F16K27/00, F16K27/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VENTILVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:VALVE DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SOUPAPE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2018Translation filed 
04.10.2018National basic fee paid 
04.10.2018Search fee paid 
04.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3913927  (GORDON ALEXANDER L) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [Y] 5;
 [X]DE10245803  (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document *;
 [IY]US2006169099  (DIEZ ARMIN [DE]) [I] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 5;
 [A]WO2015000617  (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 11 *
International search[Y]JP2015064097  (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0085]; fig. 1 to 10 & DE 102014113660 A1 *;
 [Y]JPS5828158U  (Nippon Oil Seal Industry Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-2, 7 * , fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH0437998Y  (CI Kasei Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-2, 7 * , fig. 3, 4, 7 & EP 0244877 A1 fig. 4, 7, 8 *;
 [Y]JPS5125109Y  (Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS5035259Y  (Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS53104861U  (Hooker Chemicals & Plastics Corp.) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , fig. 5 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015064097