Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3467361 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3467361



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 186
27.01.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.01.2020 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
11.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.09.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
29.03.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
21.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.12.2018 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
22.10.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
04.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
04.10.2018 Description Search / examination 31
04.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 13
04.10.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.12.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
30.11.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.11.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
30.11.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 40