Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3467361


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.01.2020 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.09.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.07.2019 Change: Validation states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - extension states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
03.05.2019 First examination report
26.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
30.03.2019 Supplementary search report published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
29.03.2019 Change - classification published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
29.03.2019 Change - classification published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.2018 Change - representative
05.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
05.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication