Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468107

EP3468107 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND IN-VEHICLE NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SASAKI Takamitsu
c/o Panasonic
Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / HAGA Tomoyuki
c/o Panasonic
Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP
03 / MAEDA Manabu
c/o Panasonic
Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP
04 / MATSUSHIMA Hideki
c/o Panasonic
Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]01 / SASAKI Takamitsu
c/o
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / HAGA Tomoyuki
c/o
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP
03 / MAEDA Manabu
c/o
Panasonic Intellectual Property Managment Co. Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP
04 / MATSUSHIMA Hideki
c/o
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802501.120.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP15815
Priority number, dateUS201662342536P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342536 P
JP2017006187427.03.2017         Original published format: JP 2017061874
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203903
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468107
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/46, H04L12/40, H04L29/08
[2019/31]
Former International [2019/16]H04L12/46, H04L12/40
Former International [2019/15]H04L12/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSEINHEIT, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND FAHRZEUGINTERNES NETZWERKSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND IN-VEHICLE NETWORK SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU EMBARQUÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2018Translation filed 
19.11.2018National basic fee paid 
19.11.2018Search fee paid 
19.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
16.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]CN103684944  (SIEMENS SIGNALLING COMPANY LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2016065298  (NAKAGAWA TETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0041] - [0150] *
International search[A]JP2008205913  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015207814  (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013123998  (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0159466 A1 entire text; all drawings & DE 102012223124 A1 *