Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468284

EP3468284 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND RANDOM ACCESS CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ISOGAWA, Takayuki
Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / OOKUBO, Naoto
Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / KIYOSHIMA, Kohei
Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
04 / TAKIGUCHI, Takahiro
Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802564.909.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP17522
Priority number, dateJP2016010683527.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016106835
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203969
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468284
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04W16/32, H04W72/04, H04W92/12, H04W92/20
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DIREKTZUGRIFFSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND RANDOM ACCESS CONTROL METHOD[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018Translation filed 
30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Search fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2014177002  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3 [I] 4,5;
 [P]EP3051914  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [P] * paragraph [0086]; figure 5 *;
 [YA]  - ERICSSON, "Impact on Random Access due to LBT", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, P.R. China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-164009 - IMPACT ON RANDOM ACCESS DUE TO LBT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105344 [Y] 2,3 * section 2.1 * [A] 1,4-6
International search[XYA]WO2014177002  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1, 4, 6 * , page 20, line 13 to page 21, line 25 & JP 2016-532338 A paragraphs [0112] to [0150] & US 2016/0205705 A1 paragraphs [0184] to [0222] & EP 3051914 A1 & CN 104519590 A * [Y] 2 [A] 3, 5;
 [YA]JP2011176738  (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0066] to [0068] & US 2011/0207466 A1 paragraphs [0087] to [0089] * [A] 3, 5;
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "Random access for Rel-13 low complexity and enhanced coverage UEs", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2#91 R2-153717, (20150814), XP050993722 [A] 1-6 * , chapter 2.1 *
 [A]  - NOKIA NETWORKS, "Random Access requirements for Dual Connectivity", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG4#72 R4-144675, (20140812), XP050799256 [A] 1-6