Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466658

EP3466658 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COMPOSITE MATERIAL MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rimtec Corporation
6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEUCHI, Masaki
c/o RIMTEC Corporation
6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802643.117.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP18514
Priority number, dateJP2016010600827.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016106008
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204051
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466658
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/48, B29C43/12, B29C43/32
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERBUNDSTOFFMATERIALFORM[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COMPOSITE MATERIAL MOLDING[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULÉ EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018Translation filed 
03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Search fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2009045924  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0001], [0002], [0016] to [0018], [0025], [0035], [0040] to [0042], [0045] to [0047]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2000239308  (SOKEN KAGAKU KK) [Y] 1-4 * , claims 1, 37; paragraphs [0001], [0008], [0013], [0049] to [0059], [0130] to [0131], [0134] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2015098636  (RIMTEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0035] to [0105] & US 2017/0037202 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0108] to [0135] & EP 3088449 A1 & KR 10-2016-0102988 A & CN 105829412 A & TW 201532796 A *
by applicantJP2014148133
 WO03062253
 JP2005515260
 WO2011079799
 JP2013516392