Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467549

EP3467549 - PROJECTION LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO Yoshihiro
C/O Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
02 / TAKAHARA Koji
C/O Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
03 / TERAMOTO Miyuki
C/O Konica Minolta Inc.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802719.919.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP18922
Priority number, dateJP2016010539126.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016105391
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204127
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467549
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/115, G02B13/16, G03B21/14
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:PROJEKTIONSLINSE[2019/15]
English:PROJECTION LENS[2019/15]
French:LENTILLE DE PROJECTION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2018Translation filed 
21.11.2018National basic fee paid 
21.11.2018Search fee paid 
21.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2015022187  (RICOH IMAGING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 16 *;
 [X]JP2014164120  (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1,2 * figures 8, 14 * * claim 4 *;
 [X]JP2007094150  (PENTAX CORP) [X] 1-3 * table all * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 3-5 *;
 [X]EP1808714  (FUJINON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 10-35 *;
 [X]EP2708922  (RICOH IMAGING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * table 6 * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0065] *
International search[Y]JP2015022187  (RICOH IMAGING CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , comparative example 1; fig. 16; paragraphs [0001], [0002] & US 2014/0078589 A1 Comparative Example 3; table 14; paragraphs [0001], [0002] & EP 2708922 A2 & CN 203643625 U *;
 [Y]JP2014164120  (OLYMPUS CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , examples 5 to 12; fig. 8, 14; paragraph [0019] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007094150  (PENTAX CORP) [Y] 1-4 * , comparative examples; fig. 5-4; paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2010079013  (NITTOH KOGAKU KK) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraph [0028] (Family: none) *