Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467027

EP3467027 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE USING SAME, AND MULTILAYER STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
27.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1008251 / JP
[2019/27]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
The Nippon Synthetic Chemical Industry Co., Ltd.
2-4, Komatsubara-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0018 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO Honoka
c/o The Nippon Synthetic Chemical Industry Co. Ltd.
2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0018 / JP
02 / KANI Shouichi
c/o The Nippon Synthetic Chemical Industry Co. Ltd.
2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0018 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802858.525.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP19451
Priority number, dateJP2016010484626.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016104846
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204272
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467027
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:C08L29/04, B32B27/28, C08K5/101
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FORMARTIKEL DAMIT UND MEHRSCHICHTIGE STRUKTUR[2019/15]
English:RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE USING SAME, AND MULTILAYER STRUCTURE[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ UTILISANT CELLE-CI, ET STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018Translation filed 
13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Search fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[E]EP3375818  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,3,4 * claims 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0097] *;
 [XP]WO2017082063  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [I]EP2554592  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [I] 1-4 * examples 2,15,16,17; table 1 * * paragraph [0042] * * claims 1,8,9 *;
 [A]EP2862898  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] *
International search[PX]WO2017082063  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-4 * , claims (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2010071241  (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , claims & US 2012/0009431 A1 claims & EP 2407508 A2 & CN 102348749 A & KR 10-2011-0128338 A *;
 [A]JPH0971620  (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-4 * , claims & US 5744547 A claims & EP 751153 A1 *;
 [A]JP2006290926  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-4 * , claims (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015083496  (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-4 * , claims & US 2016/0229987 A1 claims & WO 2015/041258 A1 & EP 3048058 A1 & CN 105722760 A *
by applicantJPH0971620