Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467889

EP3467889 - THERMOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi 448-8661 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GOUKO, Norio
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
02 / TANIGUCHI, Toshihisa
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
03 / SAKAIDA, Atusi
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
04 / OKAMOTO, Keiji
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
05 / SHIRAISHI, Yoshihiko
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
06 / ASANO, Masahiro
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17802861.925.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP19454
Priority number, dateJP2016010610327.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016106103
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204275
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467889
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L35/34, H01L35/32
[2019/18]
Former International [2019/15]H01L35/34, H01L35/32, H02N11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR THERMOELEKTRISCHEN UMWANDLUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/15]
English:THERMOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SAME[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION THERMOÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018Translation filed 
03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Search fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
03.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[YA]JP2007095897  (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 7 * , fig. 15 to 22 and explanations threof (Family: none) * [A] 1-6;
 [YA]JPH0897472  (SEIKO INSTR INC) [Y] 7 * , fig. 12 and explanation thereof & US 5824561 A fig. 12 and explanation thereof & EP 687020 A1 & TW 393788 B * [A] 1-6;
 [A]JPH07162039  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015084365  (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2016/0268493 A1 & WO 2015/060082 A1 & EP 3062357 A1 & TW 201535808 A & KR 10-2016-0058161 A & CN 105659398 A *;
 [A]JP2016072430  (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2016/051982 A1 & TW 201622191 A *;
 [A]US6127619  (XI XIAOMEI [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 1999/065086 A1 *;
 [A]JP2014042413  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005217353  (YOKOHAMA TEIKOKI KK, et al) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2014007408
 JP2010050356