Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467567

EP3467567 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR FABRY-PEROT INTERFERENCE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1, Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KASAHARA, Takashi
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
02 / SHIBAYAMA, Katsumi
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
03 / HIROSE, Masaki
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
04 / KAWAI, Toshimitsu
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
05 / OYAMA, Hiroki
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
06 / KURAMOTO, Yumi
c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Higashi-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17802912.026.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP19680
Priority number, dateJP2016010626927.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016106269
JP2016016394224.08.2016         Original published format: JP 2016163942
JP2016016391624.08.2016         Original published format: JP 2016163916
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204326
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467567
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G02B26/00, B81B3/00, B81C1/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FABRY-PEROT-INTERFERENZFILTER[2019/15]
English:PRODUCTION METHOD FOR FABRY-PEROT INTERFERENCE FILTER[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FILTRE D'INTERFÉRENCE DE FABRY-PEROT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018Translation filed 
20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]JP2015152713  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 1, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0021], [0042] to [0053]; fig. 2 & US 2016/0357009 A1 paragraphs [0028] to [0030], [0051] to [0062]; fig. 2 & WO 2015/122316 A1 & EP 3106910 A1 & CN 105992964 A & KR 10-2016-0120277 A * [A] 2-5, 8-9;
 [YA]JP2015199071  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 1, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0028], [0049] to [0068]; fig. 5 & US 2017/0106476 A1 paragraphs [0049] to [0055], [0076] to [0117]; fig. 5 & WO 2015/152156 A1 & TW 201601867 A & CN 106163724 A & KR 10-2016-0141814 A * [A] 2-5, 8-9;
 [YA]JP2009147108  (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0029]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 2-5, 8-9;
 [YA]JP2009081428  (ROHM CO LTD) [Y] 1, 6-7 * , paragraphs [0035] to [0055]; fig. 4, 6 & US 2009/0101927 A1 paragraphs [0047] to [0073]; fig. 4, 6 * [A] 2-5, 8-9
by applicantJP2013506154