Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466719

EP3466719 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO Kento
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / SAKURAI Hideyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17802940.126.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP19799
Priority number, dateJP2016010614127.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016106141
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204354
Date:30.11.2017
Language:JA
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466719
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C1/00, B60C11/03, B60C11/12, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L101/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN[2019/15]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE[2019/15]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018Translation filed 
22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Search fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[PA]WO2016084370  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * , claims & JP 2016-084370 A *;
 [PA]WO2016157906  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * , claims & JP 2016-193687 A *;
 [A]WO2015079703  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , claims; examples & US 2016/0376426 A1 claims; examples & EP 3075773 A1 & CN 10576493 A *;
 [A]JP2016074256  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1-9 * , claim 1; examples; fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) *