Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466874

EP3466874 - CARBON MATERIAL COATED WITH TANTALUM CARBIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tokai Carbon Korea Co. Ltd.
71 Gaejeongsaneopdanji-ro
Miyang-myeon
Anseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 17602 / KR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / JO, Dong Wan
(Lottecastle Central City)
No. 123-1504
4725 Seodong-daero
Daedeok-myeon
Anseong-si Gyeonggi-do 17544 / KR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Junkersgatan 1
582 35 Linköping / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803053.224.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017KR05358
Priority number, dateKR2016006425525.05.2016         Original published format: KR 20160064255
[2019/15]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204534
Date:30.11.2017
Language:KO
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466874
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C01B32/10, C01B32/914, C01G35/00, H01L21/56, H01L21/683
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MIT TANTALCARBID BESCHICHTETES KOHLENSTOFFMATERIAL[2019/15]
English:CARBON MATERIAL COATED WITH TANTALUM CARBIDE[2019/15]
French:MATÉRIAU CARBONÉ REVÊTU DE CARBURE DE TANTALE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2004084057  (IBIDEN CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * See paragraph [0086]; claim 1; figure 4; and tables 1, 2. *;
 [X]KR20070020225  (TOYO TANSO CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * See paragraphs [0038], [0126]; figure 19; and tables 1, 2. *;
 [A]KR20120104260  (TOYO TANSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-32. *;
 [A]KR101591050B  (YIM KWANG HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1, 2, 4. *;
 [A]KR20150114942  (TOYO TANSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-14. *
by applicantKR101100041B