blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3466874 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780023205 EP17803053



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019515128Global Dossier 06.06.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017KR05358 24.05.2017
KR20160064255 25.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109153571Global Dossier 04.01.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017KR05358 24.05.2017
KR20160064255 25.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3466874Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2017KR05358 24.05.2017
KR20160064255 25.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017204534Global Dossier 30.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
KR20160064255 25.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101824883BGlobal Dossier 02.02.2018B1
KR20170133155 05.12.2017A
Priority number Date
KR20160064255 25.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201815672 01.05.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20160064255 25.05.2016