Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465691

EP3465691 - ASYMMETRICAL WRITE DRIVER FOR RESISTIVE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTEL Corporation
2200 Mission College Blvd.
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Huichu
320 Crescent Village Circle
Unit 1489
San Jose, California 95134 / US
02 / MORRIS, Daniel H.
2278 NW Thorncroft Drive 231
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
03 / MANIPATRUNI, Sasikanth
6993 NE Ronler Way 1817
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US
04 / VAIDYANATHAN, Kaushik
3600 Juliette Lane SC12-303
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
05 / YOUNG, Ian A.
3181 NW 114th Terrace
Portland, OR 97229 / US
06 / KARNIK, Tanay
14585 NW Oak Shadow Court
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803227.220.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US28652
Priority number, dateUS20161516466525.05.2016         Original published format: US201615164665
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204957
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465691
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G11C13/00, G11C11/16
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ASYMMETRISCHER SCHREIBTREIBER FÜR RESISTIVEN SPEICHER[2019/15]
English:ASYMMETRICAL WRITE DRIVER FOR RESISTIVE MEMORY[2019/15]
French:PILOTE D'ÉCRITURE ASYMÉTRIQUE POUR MÉMOIRE RÉSISTIVE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2018National basic fee paid 
23.10.2018Search fee paid 
23.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
23.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2004125650  (TAKAHARU TSUJI) [Y] 1-3, 8-13, 17-24 * See paragraphs [0018], [0047], [0051], [0057], [0080], [0088]-[0089]; and figures 1, 3, 5. * [A] 4-7, 14-16;
 [Y]US2008101110  (THOMAS HAPP et al.) [Y] 1-3, 8-13, 17-24 * See claims 10, 24. *;
 [Y]US2015130534  (INTEL CORPORATION) [Y] 17-20 * See claim 11. *;
 [A]US2009027956  (BYUNG-GIL CHOI et al.) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0072]; and figures 4-10. *;
 [A]US2016019962  (RAMBUS INC.) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0055]; and figures 1-6. *