Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465979

EP3465979 - SECURE GATEWAYS FOR CONNECTED DISPENSING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pepsico, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GONG, George Xu
c/o PEPSICO Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, New York 10577 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803244.728.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US30121
Priority number, dateUS20161516590726.05.2016         Original published format: US201615165907
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204996
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465979
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/30, H04L9/32
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SICHERE GATEWAYS FÜR VERBUNDENE SPENDERAUTOMATEN[2019/15]
English:SECURE GATEWAYS FOR CONNECTED DISPENSING MACHINES[2019/15]
French:PASSERELLES SÉCURISÉES POUR DISTRIBUTEURS CONNECTÉS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2018National basic fee paid 
23.11.2018Search fee paid 
23.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
23.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
03.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2014341217  (EISNER MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 17-20 * ; paragraphs [0044]-[0046], [0050], [0056], [0085], [0089], [0112], [0192], [0269] *;
 [Y]US6796490  (DRUMMOND JAY PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 17-20 * ; figures 1, 2; column 5, lines 29-31; column 6, line 59 to column 7, line 5; column 8, lines 11-21 *;
 [Y]US2005043011  (MURRAY TOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 2, 7, 18, 20 * ; paragraphs [0038], [0052], [0212] *;
 [A]US2007106559  (HARRELL DANIEL C [US]) [A] 1-8, 17-20 * ; entire document *