Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465508

EP3465508 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM FOR MASKING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Informatica LLC
2100 Seaport Blvd.
Redwood City, CA 94063-4755 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BALABINE, Igor
3 Carriage Court
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / KUMARESAN, Bala
10387 Amistad Ct
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17803329.619.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33561
Priority number, dateUS20161516158623.05.2016         Original published format: US201615161586
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205208
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465508
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00, G06F11/30
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM ZUR MASKIERUNG VON DATEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM FOR MASKING DATA[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR DE MASQUAGE DE DONNÉES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011113050  (YOUN PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US9141659  (MIDDLEMAN PAUL [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 8 *
International search[X]US2011113050  (YOUN PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-57 * , entire document especially paras [0027], [0031], [0032], [0033], [0035). [0037], [0038], [0039], [0044] *;
 [A]US2010074441  (PAUKER MATTHEW J [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2012324215  (KIM DUK-SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-57 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2011129086  (SCHNEIDER JAMES PAUL [US]) [A] 1-57 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2007211678  (LI JUNYI [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * , entire document *