Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464703

EP3464703 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING SANITATION AGENTS IN A LAUNDRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TCD Parts, Inc.
19450 Highway B
Edgerton, Missouri 64444 / US
For all designated states
Brightwell Dispensers Limited
Unit 9
Euro Business Park
Estate Road
Newhaven, East Sussex BN9 0DQ / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FISHER, Mark B.
19450 Highway B
Edgerton, Missouri 64444 / US
02 / GROSS, Joel
1841 E. Washington Avenue
Gilbert, Arizona 85234 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bridge-Butler, Jeremy
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803365.022.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33817
Priority number, dateUS201662340334P23.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340334 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205280
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464703
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:D06F1/00, D06F33/00, D06F33/02, D06F39/00, D06F39/02, D06F35/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON SANITÄRMITTELN IN EINEM WASCHSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING SANITATION AGENTS IN A LAUNDRY SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE D'AGENTS D'ASSAINISSEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE BLANCHISSERIE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2018National basic fee paid 
20.11.2018Search fee paid 
20.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2012324995  (TINCHER et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2002096537  (GARDNER, JR.) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [Y]WO2009056613  (GLAXO GROUP LIMITED) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2015204701  (KLICPERA) [Y] 4-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US5500050  (CHAN et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010000024  (HENDRICKSON et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010212704  (KAN et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2008110479  (VEENING et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2014182068  (WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION) [A] 1-20 * entire document *