Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3464703 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3464703



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 110
29.11.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.11.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
29.11.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
29.11.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
29.11.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
29.11.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
28.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.06.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
20.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.12.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
30.11.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
30.11.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 37