blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3464703


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.07.2019 Change: Validation states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - extension states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
02.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2019 Change: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2018 Change - representative
20.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication