blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3464703
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9951459Global Dossier 24.04.2018B2
US2017335503 23.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715601293 22.05.2017
US201662340334 23.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3464703Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2017US33817 22.05.2017
US201662340334 23.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017205280Global Dossier 30.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662340334 23.05.2016