Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466011

EP3466011 - METHOD FOR WAVEFORM BANDWIDTH COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astrapi Corporation
100 Crescent Court
Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75201 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PROTHERO, Jerrold
P.O. Box 57
Washington, DC 20044 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803389.023.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33915
Priority number, dateUS201662340104P23.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340104 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205319
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466011
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26, H04L27/02, H04L27/34, H04L27/18
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR WELLENFORMBANDBREITENKOMPRESSION[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR WAVEFORM BANDWIDTH COMPRESSION[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMPRESSION DE LARGEUR DE BANDE DE FORME D'ONDE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011222584  (ALAN J. MICHAELS) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0105], [0114]; and figures 7A-8. *;
 [A]US2015156049  (ASTRAPI CORPORATION) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0027]; claim 1; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2012076098  (SEUNG HEE HAN et al.) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0212]-[0219]; and figure 8. *;
 [A]WO2010004586  (CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE IN WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0041]; and figures 1-10. *;
 [A]US2008304666  (DAVID B. CHESTER et al.) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0134]; and figures 1-6. *