Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463158

EP3463158 - CANNULA ASSEMBLIES FOR USE WITH ROBOTIC SURGICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KOPP, Brock
203 Montowese Street Rear 2
Branford Connecticut 06405 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803488.024.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34178
Priority number, dateUS201662341888P26.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662341888 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205467
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463158
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B34/30, A61B17/3209, A61B17/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:KANÜLENANORDNUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT CHIRURGISCHEN ROBOTERSYSTEMEN[2019/15]
English:CANNULA ASSEMBLIES FOR USE WITH ROBOTIC SURGICAL SYSTEMS[2019/15]
French:ENSEMBLES CANULES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS AVEC DES SYSTÈMES CHIRURGICAUX ROBOTIQUES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2006161136  (ANDERSON, C. S. et al.) [Y] 8, 9 * See paragraphs [0071]-[0091]; figures 10-26B. * [A] 1-7, 10-12;
 [Y]US2013164075  (MURPHY, S. B.) [Y] 8, 9 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0019]; figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2014296872  (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS, INC.) [A] 1-12 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]US2013338679  (TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITEIT EINDHOVEN) [A] 1-12 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]EP1625863  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORPORATION) [A] 1-12 * See the whole document. *