Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463982

EP3463982 - VEHICLE DISPLAY WITH SELECTIVE IMAGE DATA DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gentex Corporation
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, MI 49464 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BOSTROM, David M.
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US
02 / SMEYERS, Marc A.
5984 88th Ave
Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803498.924.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34228
Priority number, dateUS201662340697P24.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340697 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205490
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463982
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU30.11.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/18, B60K35/00
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/15]B60R1/04, B60R1/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGANZEIGE MIT SELEKTIVER BILDDATENANZEIGE[2019/15]
English:VEHICLE DISPLAY WITH SELECTIVE IMAGE DATA DISPLAY[2019/15]
French:AFFICHAGE DE VÉHICULE À AFFICHAGE SÉLECTIF DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Search fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2015085121  (ENGLANDER BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0100] - [0104] * [I] 2-9;
 [A]WO2015174383  (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 6 * * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 4 * * page 31, line 18 - page 33, line 19 *;
 [A]US2016029111  (WACQUANT SYLVIE [DE], et al) [A] 3,4 * figure 8 * * claims 10,11 * * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US2014340516  (VOJTISEK MARK G [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] *
International search[XA]US2015085121  (ENGLANDER BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 9, 18 * , abstract, paragraphs [0058]-[0108], fig.1-16 * [A] 1-8, 10-12, 19-20;
 [A]US2015331519  (LINDAHL JOHN O [US], et al) [A] 1-12, 18-20 * , abstract, paragraphs [0101]-[0128], fig. 1-22 *;
 [A]CN202608663U  (REN YE) [A] 1-12, 18-20 * , abstract, fig. 1-2 *