Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465804

EP3465804 - ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL HAVING SOLID lONICALLY CONDUCTING POLYMER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ionic Materials, Inc.
10-M Commerce Way
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ZIMMERMAN, Michael, A.
55 Rosemont Drive
No. Andover MA 01845 / US
02 / GAVRILOV, Alexei, B.
4133 Inwood Drive
Woburn MA 01801 / US
03 / LIU, Ting
77 West Street
Wilmington MA 01887 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803591.125.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34495
Priority number, dateUS201662342432P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342432 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205634
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465804
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/137, H01M4/36, H01M4/50, H01M4/60
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ELECTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE MIT FESTEM, IONISCH LEITENDEM POLYMERMATERIAL[2019/15]
English:ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL HAVING SOLID lONICALLY CONDUCTING POLYMER MATERIAL[2019/15]
French:CELLULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE COMPRENANT UN MATÉRIAU POLYMÈRE SOLIDE CONDUCTEUR PAR MIGRATION DES IONS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2015155559  (ZIMMERMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012321970  (FRIESEN CODY A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2003069343  (SMITH PAUL [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2011274990  (XU YANG G [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *