Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465776

EP3465776 - RESONANT-CAVITY INFRARED PHOTODETECTORS WITH FULLY-DEPLETED ABSORBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary of the Navy
Naval Research Laboratory
875 North Randolph Street
Suite 1425
Arlington, VA 22203 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MEYER, Jerry, R.
121 Oak Drive
Catonsville MD 21228 / US
02 / VURGAFTMAN, Igor
492 St. Martins Lane
Severna Park MD 21146 / US
03 / CANEDY, Chadwick, Lawrence
910 M St NW 902
Washington DC 20001 / US
04 / BEWLEY, William, W.
3509 Gordon Street
Falls Church VA 22041 / US
05 / KIM, Chul, Soo
6400 Wainfleet Ct.
Springfield VA 22152 / US
06 / MERRITT, Charles, D.
4957 Swinton Drive
Fairfax VA 22032 / US
07 / WARREN, Michael, V.
900 Army-navy Drive Apt. 1213
Arlington VA 22202 / US
08 / KIM, Mijin
6400 Wainfleet Ct.
Springfeild VA 22152 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17803639.826.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34608
Priority number, dateUS201662342260P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342260 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205707
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465776
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/101, H01L31/0232, H01L31/032
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:INFRAROTRESONATORPHOTODETEKTOREN MIT VOLLSTÄNDIG ERSCHÖPFTEN ABSORBERN[2019/15]
English:RESONANT-CAVITY INFRARED PHOTODETECTORS WITH FULLY-DEPLETED ABSORBERS[2019/15]
French:PHOTODÉTECTEURS INFRAROUGES À CAVITÉ RÉSONANTE DOTÉS D'ABSORBEURS TOTALEMENT APPAUVRIS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2018National basic fee paid 
02.11.2018Search fee paid 
02.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
14.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP1577959  (LUMILEDS LIGHTING U.S., LLC) [Y] 1, 2, 5, 6, 9, 13-16 * See paragraphs [0013], [0035]-[0037]; claim 10; and figures 2, 8. * [A] 3, 4, 7, 8, 10-12;
 [Y]US6013912  (JEAN-LOUIS PAUTRAT et al.) [Y] 1, 2, 5, 6, 9, 13-16 * See column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 57; claims 1, 3; and figures 1-3. *;
 [A]US2002030198  (CARRIE CARTER COMAN et al.) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0039]; and figures 2-4f. *;
 [A]US2009127462  (SARATH D. GUNAPALA et al.) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0022]; and figures 3A-5. *
 [Y]  - G. BISHOP et al., "nBn detectors based on InAs/GaSb type-II strain layer superlattice", Journal of Vacuum Science & Technology B, Nanotechnology and Microelectronics: Materials, Processing, Measurement, and Phenomena, (20080500), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 1145 - 1147, XP012114248 [Y] 13-16 * ; and figure 2. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.2830627