EP3465458 - MOBILE OVERLAY VIRTUAL ENTERPRISE NETWORK AND VIRTUAL INTERNET FOR ENTERPRISES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netfoundry Inc. 101 S. Tryon Street, Suite 2700 Charlotte, NC 28280 / US | [2020/19] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Tata Communications (America) Inc. 2355 Dulles Corner Boulevard 7th Floor Herndon, VA 20171 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDAU, John 2355 Dulles Corner Boulevard Herndon, VA 20171 / US | 02 /
ZINO, Galeal 245 Fly Fisher Drive Salisbury, NC 28147 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17803669.5 | 26.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US34704 | Priority number, date | US201662341719P | 26.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662341719 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017205755 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465458 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3465458 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/102, H04L45/64, H04L45/02, H04L45/74, G06F15/173, H04L65/80 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L45/64 (EP,US);
G06F15/173 (EP,US);
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/08 (EP,US);
H04L45/20 (US);
H04L45/56 (US);
H04L45/74 (EP,US);
H04L65/102 (EP,US);
H04L45/302 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G06F15/173, H04L12/715, H04L12/24 | ||
Former IPC [2019/15] | G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | MOBILES VIRTUELLES OVERLAY-UNTERNEHMENSNETZWERK UND VIRTUELLES INTERNET FÜR UNTERNEHMEN | [2019/15] | English: | MOBILE OVERLAY VIRTUAL ENTERPRISE NETWORK AND VIRTUAL INTERNET FOR ENTERPRISES | [2019/15] | French: | RÉSEAU D'ENTREPRISE VIRTUEL SUPERPOSÉ MOBILE, ET INTERNET VIRTUEL POUR ENTREPRISES | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 26.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2006265508 (ANGEL FRANKLIN J [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0705] - paragraph [0707] * [A] 1-10,14-18; | [XAI]US8787154 (MEDVED JAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 41 * * column 8, line 40 - line 55 * [A] 9-18 [I] 3,7,8; | [A]US2015365314 (HISCOCK JAMES S [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0036] ** paragraph [0044] *; | [IAY] - SEBASTIEN MONNET ET AL, "MOve: Design of An Application-Malleable Overlay", RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2006. SRDS '06. 25TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20061001), ISBN 978-0-7695-2677-5, pages 355 - 364, XP031031963 [I] 9,10,14-18 * abstract * * page 2, column 3, paragraph 1 - page 2, column 4, paragraph 1 * * page 3, column 5, paragraph 2 * * page 3, column 5, paragraph 5 - page 4, column 8, paragraph 2 * * page 10, column 19, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-8 [Y] 11-13 | International search | [A]US2015188751 (VASSEUR JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14* , entire document. *; | [Y]US2016094398 (CHOUDHURY ABHIJIT KUMAR [US], et al) [Y] 5-6 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0038], [0053], [0236], [0242]-[0243]. *; | [XY]US2016105471 (NUNES DUARTE [ES], et al) [X] 1-4, 7-14 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0009], [0024], [0027], [0043], [0060]-[0062], [0139]-[0142], [0179][0184]. * [Y] 5-6 | by applicant | US9071607 |