Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3563243

EP3563243 - DETERMINING APPLICATION TEST RESULTS USING SCREENSHOT METADATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BUDUREAN, Cristina Elena
6 Pancras Square
6 King's Blvd
N1C 4AG Kings Cross / CH
02 / GAYWOOD, Richard Michael
6 Pancras Square
6 King's Blvd
N1C 4AG Kings Cross / CH
03 / HURLEY, Fergus Gerard
6 Pancras Square
6 King's Blvd
N1C 4AG Kings Cross / CH
04 / TONOLLO, Johannes
6 Pancras Square
6 King's Blvd
N1C 4AG Kings Cross / CH
05 / HUGHES, Dino Derek
6 Pancras Square
6 King's Blvd
N1C 4AG Kings Cross / CH
06 / ADAMS, Philip James
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
 [2019/45]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/45]
Application number, filing date17804713.031.10.2017
[2019/45]
WO2017US59355
Priority number, dateUS20171546254717.03.2017         Original published format: US201715462547
[2019/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018169573
Date:20.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3563243
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018
[2019/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2019/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG VON ANWENDUNGSTESTERGEBNISSEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SCREENSHOT-METADATEN[2019/45]
English:DETERMINING APPLICATION TEST RESULTS USING SCREENSHOT METADATA[2019/45]
French:DÉTERMINATION DE RÉSULTATS DE TEST D'APPLICATION À L'AIDE DE MÉTADONNÉES DE CAPTURE D'ÉCRAN[2019/45]
Entry into regional phase02.08.2019National basic fee paid 
02.08.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/45]
02.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2014075344  (BENTRUP KEITH [US]) [Y] 1-3,7-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0060] * * the whole document * [A] 4-6;
 [YA]WO2012027886  (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-15 * abstract * * sentence 3, paragraph 2 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 4-6;
 [YA]US2015086115  (DANKO KRISZTIAN [CA]) [Y] 1-3,7-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0042] * * the whole document * [A] 4-6