Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467352

EP3467352 - TEMPERATURE REGULATING VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZHEJIANG SANHUA AUTOMOTIVE COMPONENTS CO., LTD.
301, 12th Street
Hangzhou Economic & Technological Development Area
Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310018 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / QIU, Haoming
301 12th Street Hangzhou
Economic&Technological Development Area
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN
02 / LV, Xiaodan
301 12th Street Hangzhou
Economic&Technological Development Area
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN
03 / PAN, Tao
301 12th Street Hangzhou
Economic&Technological Development Area
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN
04 / LUO, Yongjin
301 12th Street Hangzhou
Economic&Technological Development Area
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310018 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17805651.116.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN84497
Priority number, dateCN20161037395231.05.2016         Original published format: CN201610373952
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017206706
Date:07.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467352
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/13, F16H57/04, F16N23/00, F01M5/00, F16K17/00
[2020/01]
Former International [2019/15]F16H57/04, F16N23/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURREGELVENTIL[2019/15]
English:TEMPERATURE REGULATING VALVE[2019/15]
French:SOUPAPE DE RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2018Translation filed 
17.09.2018National basic fee paid 
17.09.2018Search fee paid 
17.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012085436  (MECAPLAST SA [MC], et al) [X] 1 * Page 1 lines 10-12, 29-30, page 4 lines 19-24, 35-36, page 5 lines 1-3, 8-21, page 6 line 25; Figures 2-3, 8-9. * [I] 2-10;
 [XI]US2010126594  (SHEPPARD JEFFREY OWEN [CA]) [X] 1 * Paragraphs [0001], [0037]-[0041], [0043], [0049]-[0052]; Figures 1-3, 5, 11, 12, 16-18. * [I] 2-10
International search[A]CN204943001U  (ZHEJIANG SANHUA AUTOMOTIVE COMPONENTS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * description, embodiment, and figures 1-5 *;
 [A]CN103574264  (ZHEJIANG SANHUA AUTOMOBILE COMPONENTS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN102322512  (ZHEJIANG SANHUA AUTOMOBILE PARTS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN104344063  (ZHEJIANG SANHUA AUTOMOTIVE COMPONENTS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN2103703U  (XIE LAI [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102009023824  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2016089634  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole *