blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3388956

EP3388956 - MEDIA INFORMATION DISPLAY METHOD, SERVER, AND DATA STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.03.2022
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2022Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.04.2022  [2022/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited
35/F, Tencent Building
Kejizhongyi Road
Midwest District of Hi-tech Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/42]
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Mengting
35/F Tencent Building
Kejizhongyi Road
Midwest District of Hi-Tech Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / TANG, Zhendong
35/F Tencent Building
Kejizhongyi Road
Midwest District of Hi-Tech Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / HU, Qin
35/F Tencent Building
Kejizhongyi Road
Midwest District of Hi-Tech Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2018/42]AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date17805729.525.05.2017
[2018/42]
WO2017CN85834
Priority number, dateCN20161037971401.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610379714
[2018/42]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017206784
Date:07.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3388956
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30
[2018/42]
CPC:
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US); G06F16/435 (EP,CN,KR,US); G06F16/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/90332 (KR); G06F16/9535 (EP,CN,US); G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON MEDIENINFORMATIONEN, SERVER UND DATENSPEICHERMEDIUM[2018/42]
English:MEDIA INFORMATION DISPLAY METHOD, SERVER, AND DATA STORAGE MEDIUM[2018/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS MULTIMÉDIA, SERVEUR ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES[2018/42]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2018Translation filed 
13.07.2018National basic fee paid 
13.07.2018Search fee paid 
13.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
13.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2021Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2021
26.11.2021Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.12.2021Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/17]
17.12.2021Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009164897  (AMER-YAHIA SIHEM [US], et al);
 [A]US2009287687  (MARTIRE GIANNI [US], et al);
 [I]US2013151530  (CHEN MIN [CN], et al)
International search[A]CN102375844  (TENCENT DIGITAL TIANJIN CO LTD);
 [A]CN104090884  (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD);
 [A]US8924465  (TUNGUZ-ZAWISLAK TOMASZ J [US]);
 [A]CN105608125  (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD );
 [PX]CN106126519  (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD )
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.