Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466940

EP3466940 - CRYSTAL FORM OF SODIUM-GLUCOSE COTRANSPORTER 2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hainan Xuanzhu Pharma Co., Ltd.
27th Floor, Tianyi International Building
No. 85 Binhai Avenue, Longhua District
Haikou
Hainan 570105 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SHU, Chutian
2518 Tianchen Road
National High-Tech Development Zone
Jinan Shandong 250101 / CN
02 / WANG, Zhenhua
2518 Tianchen Road
National High-Tech Development Zone
Jinan Shandong 250101 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bottero, Carlo , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17805772.527.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN86269
Priority number, dateCN20161036970528.05.2016         Original published format: CN201610369705
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017206827
Date:07.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466940
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D309/10, C07D207/16, A61K31/401, A61K31/351, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P5/50
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:KRISTALLFORM VON NATRIUM-GLUCOSE-COTRANSPORTERS-2-INHIBITOR[2019/15]
English:CRYSTAL FORM OF SODIUM-GLUCOSE COTRANSPORTER 2 INHIBITOR[2019/15]
French:FORME CRISTALLINE DE L'INHIBITEUR DU COTRANSPORTEUR DE SODIUM-GLUCOSE DE TYPE 2[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018Translation filed 
21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Search fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]CN104761522  (XUANZHU PHARMA CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * see the whole document, especially claims 2 and 12-15, and embodiment 1 *;
 [A]EP2891654  (XUANZHU PHARMA CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14 * see the whole document, especially claims 2 and 12-15, and embodiment 1 *