Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467180

EP3467180 - RFID IDENTIFICATION FUNCTION-BASED WASHING MACHINE CONTROL METHOD AND WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qingdao Haier Washing Machine Co., Ltd.
No. 1 Haier Road
Hi-Tech Zone
Qingdao
Shandong 266101 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YIN, Junming
No.1 Haier Road
Hi-Tech Zone
Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN
02 / HUANG, Zhenxing
No.1 Haier Road
Hi-Tech Zone
Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN
03 / XU, Sheng
No.1 Haier Road
Hi-Tech Zone
Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17805879.801.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN86898
Priority number, dateCN20161038215001.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610382150
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017206934
Date:07.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467180
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:D06F33/02, D06F39/00
[2019/45]
Former International [2019/15]D06F33/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:AUF RFID-FUNKTION BASIERENDES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE WASCHMASCHINE UND WASCHMASCHINE[2019/15]
English:RFID IDENTIFICATION FUNCTION-BASED WASHING MACHINE CONTROL METHOD AND WASHING MACHINE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MACHINE À LAVER BASÉE SUR UNE FONCTION D'IDENTIFICATION RFID ET MACHINE À LAVER[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018Translation filed 
06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]CN1891892  (LG ELECTRONICS TIANJIN [CN]) [I] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2006025650  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0127] *;
 [A]WO2006009375  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0143] *;
 [A]EP2568077  (BOTTRILL ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0061] *;
 [A]EP2302122  (BSH ELECTRODOMESTICOS ESPANA [ES]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0037] *;
 [A]US2007261713  (CHOI SEUNG B [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0140] *;
 [A]JP2005211214  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
 [A]  - DARIANIAN M ET AL, "Smart Home Mobile RFID-Based Internet-of-Things Systems and Services", ADVANCED COMPUTER THEORY AND ENGINEERING, 2008. ICACTE '08. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081220), ISBN 978-0-7695-3489-3, pages 116 - 120, XP031399789 [A] 1-12 * page 116 - page 119 *
International search[X]CN1891892  (LG ELECTRONICS TIANJIN [CN]) [X] 1-12 * , description, page 3, particular embodiments, paragraph 2 to page 6, paragraph 5, and figures 1-3 *;
 [X]WO2006025650  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-12 * , description, paragraphs 42-130, and figures 1-6 *;
 [A]CN103726262  (FOSHAN SHUNDE SINCERE HOME HOME APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN1888222  (LG ELECTRONICS TIANJIN [CN]) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JP2002360968  (SHARP KK) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2014157526  (LARMO ANNA [FI], et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP2568077  (BOTTRILL ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *