Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468183

EP3468183 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUDIO AND VIDEO SYNCHRONIZATION TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE THIRD RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF MINISTRY OF PUBLIC SECURITY
No. 76 Yue Yang Road
Xu Hui District
Shanghai 200031 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RONG, Ling
76 Yue Yang Road
Xu Hui District
Shanghai 200031 / CN
02 / WANG, Lijuan
76 Yue Yang Road
Xu Hui District
Shanghai 200031 / CN
03 / BAO, Yiming
76 Yue Yang Road
Xu Hui District
Shanghai 200031 / CN
04 / YANG, Zhuying
76 Yue Yang Road
Xu Hui District
Shanghai 200031 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Chaillot
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17805880.602.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN86916
Priority number, dateCN20161039209903.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610392099
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017206935
Date:07.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468183
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N17/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUDIO- UND VIDEOSYNCHRONISATIONSTEST[2019/15]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUDIO AND VIDEO SYNCHRONIZATION TEST[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION DE TESTS DE SYNCHRONISATION AUDIO ET VIDÉO[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2018Translation filed 
03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]CN106060534  (THIRD RES INST MINISTRY PUBLIC SECURITY) [PX] 1-20 * , claims 1-20 *;
 [X]CN104023229  (THIRD RES INST MINI PUBL SECU, et al) [X] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs [0025]-[0055], and figures 1-5 *;
 [A]CN101796812  (LEITCH TECHNOLOGY INTERNAT INC) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN105100794  (SHENZHEN TCL NEW TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document the whole document *