Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468183 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468183



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 206
02.12.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
02.12.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.12.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
21.11.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
18.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 13
18.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.03.2019 Change to the inventor details Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.03.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
21.12.2018 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
30.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 12
30.04.2018 Description Search / examination 38
30.04.2018 Drawings Search / examination 6
30.04.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
21.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
07.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 39