Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3468183 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610392099 EP17805880



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3468183Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
CN201610392099 03.06.2016
WO2017CN86916 02.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017206935Global Dossier 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
CN201610392099 03.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN106060534Global Dossier 26.10.2016A
Priority number Date
CN201610392099 03.06.2016