Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466044

EP3466044 - METHOD OF PRINTING FULL COLOUR IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Liefferink, Hauke Maritz
70 Valriche Estate
12 Broadacres Drive
Broadacres AH
2055 Sandton / ZA
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hamer, Christopher K. , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17805958.022.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB52998
Priority number, dateZA2016000366430.05.2016         Original published format: ZA 201603664
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208108
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466044
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/52, H04N1/405, H04N1/60, H04N1/54
[2020/06]
Former International [2019/15]H04N1/52, H04N1/405
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKEN VON VOLLFARBBILDERN[2019/15]
English:METHOD OF PRINTING FULL COLOUR IMAGES[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION D'IMAGES MULTI-COULEURS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]CN104320561  (SHANGHAI PUBLISHING AND PRINTING COLLEGE) [A] 1 * Claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2012314260  (HAKAMADA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * Paragraph [0044] *;
 [A]US2006082844  (WHITE DON M [US]) [A] 1 * Claims 1,4 *