Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463879

EP3463879 - METHOD TO UNIFORMLY DEBUNDLE AND EVENLY DISTRIBUTE HIGH FIBER COUNT CARBON TOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Exteriors Inc.
50 Casmir Court
Concord, Ontario L4K 4J5 / CA
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PACHHA, Ranjit
94 Bernadino Street
Brampton Ontario L6P 4J1 / CA
02 / ROBBINS, Jeffrey
5060 Birkdale Drive
Ann Arbor Michigan 48103 / US
03 / TRUDEAU, Paul
1961 Oakdean Crescent
Gloucester ON K1J 6H6 / CA
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806005.902.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB53283
Priority number, dateUS201662345481P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345481 P
US201762445063P11.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762445063 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208206
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463879
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:B32B37/24, B32B27/04, B32B38/18
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR EINHEITLICHEN ENTBÜNDELUNG UND GLEICHMÄSSIGEN VERTEILUNG EINES KOHLENSTOFFGELEGES MIT HOHER FASERZAHL[2019/15]
English:METHOD TO UNIFORMLY DEBUNDLE AND EVENLY DISTRIBUTE HIGH FIBER COUNT CARBON TOW[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SÉPARER UNIFORMÉMENT ET DE RÉPARTIR RÉGULIÈREMENT UN FAISCEAU DE CARBONE À NOMBRE DE FIBRES ÉLEVÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03031135  (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Also, milled fibers, carbon/graphite fiber strands, carbon/graphite powder, carbon/graphite flakes, or short fiber strands (8 mm or less) may be mixed into the paste 104,110 to help modulus or CLTE.;; figure 4; claims 41,42 *;
 [A]WO2016039326  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1;
 EP3196237  [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0096]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4406058  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * roll nips 6;; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9300221  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * This apparatus uses a pair of counterrotating rolls 46 which feed tow 14 through the rolls at a very precise feed rate. A pair of counterrotating accelerator rolls 48, moving at a much faster rate compared to feed rolls 46, pull or pinch off slivers from the tow, which are then blown onto sheet 10 by a venturi-type blower 50 having side walls 52, such as the TRANSVECTOR blower available from Vortec Corp. of Cincinnati, Ohio. Blower 50 is provided with two air hoses 51.;; figure 1b *
International search[A]GB1427505  (MATERIAL SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 0 *page 3, line 75- page 4, line 55; Figure 1*;
 [A]US2003099734  (BRADISH FRANK W [US]) [A] 0 *Figure 1; [0019]-[0034]*;
 [A]EP0495556  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 0 *abstract; Figures*;
 [A]US4345927  (PICONE CHARLES E) [A] 0 *abstract; Figure 1; claim 9*