Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3462917

EP3462917 - METHOD OF GENERATING BACTERIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The State of Israel, Ministry of Agriculture & Rural Development, Agricultural Research Organization (ARO) (Volcani Center)
Volcani Center
P.O. Box 15159
7528809 Rishon-LeZion / IL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEMESH, Moshe
25 Odem Street Apt. 3
7174635 Modiln / IL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Luppi, Emanuele
Brunacci & Partners S.r.l.
Via Scaglia Est, 19-31
41126 Modena / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806027.329.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IL50603
Priority number, dateUS201662342975P29.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342975 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208237
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3462917
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23L33/135, C12R1/125, C12R1/25, A61K35/742
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BAKTERIELLEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD OF GENERATING BACTERIAL COMPOSITIONS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSITIONS BACTÉRIENNES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Search fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]US2017020178  (RUBIN JORDAN SETH [US]) [PX] 1-5, 7-12, 18-27, 29-36 * claims 1, 3; paragraphs [0012], [0014] *
 [X]  - ADELYA ZHANDALGAROVA et al., "PROBIOTICS OF NEW GENERATION ON THE BASIS OF THE GENERA BACILLUS, BIFIDOBACTERIUM AND LACTOBACILLUS IN THE COMPOSITION OF THE STARTING FEED AS GROWTH PROMOTERS STURGEON FISH", World Aquaculture 2015 - Meeting Abstract, (20150531), URL: https://www.was.org/Meetings/ShowAbstract.aspx?Id=35374, XP055443991 [X] 1-5, 8-12, 20, 22-24, 26-30 * whole document *
 [X]  - LEBEER, S. et al., "Impact of Environmental and Genetic Factors on Biofilm Formation by the Probiotic Strain Lactobacillus rhamnosus GG", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20070907), pages 6768 - 6775, XP055432832 [X] 1, 2, 5-7, 10-36 * page 6768, first paragraph; page 6770, right column, second paragraph - page 6772, right column, first paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.01393-07