Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464237

EP3464237 - NOVEL PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF GADOLINIUM COMPLEX OF (4S)-4-(4-ETHOXYBENZYL)-3,6,9-TRIS(CARBOXYLATOMETHYL)-3,6,9- TRIAZAUNDECANEDIOIC ACID DISODIUM (GADOXETATE DISODIUM) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd.
Plot No. 92
1-98/2/92
Phase II
Kavuri Hills
Jubilee Hills, Hyderabad 500033 / IN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PULLAGURLA, Manik Reddy
Plot No. 92
1-98/2/92
Phase II
Kavuri Hills
Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN
02 / PITTA, Bhaskar Reddy
Plot No. 92
1-98/2/92
Phase II
Kavuri Hills
Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN
03 / NAMANI, Suresh Babu
Plot Number 92
1-98/2/92
Phase II
Kavuri Hills
Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN
04 / RANGISETTY, Jagadeesh Babu
Plot No. 92
1-98/2/92
Phase II
Kavuri Hills
Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 / IN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Chas. Hude A/S
H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1780 Copenhagen V / DK
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806041.430.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IN50209
Priority number, dateIN20164101846030.05.2016         Original published format: IN201641018460
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208258
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464237
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IN07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07C229/16, C07F5/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GADOLINIUMKOMPLEX AUS (4S)-4(4-ETHOXYBENZYL)-3,6,9-TRIS(CARBOXYLATOMETHYL)-3,6,9-TRIAZAUNDECANDISÄURE-DINATRIUM (GADOXETAT-DINATRIUM)[2019/15]
English:NOVEL PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF GADOLINIUM COMPLEX OF (4S)-4-(4-ETHOXYBENZYL)-3,6,9-TRIS(CARBOXYLATOMETHYL)-3,6,9- TRIAZAUNDECANEDIOIC ACID DISODIUM (GADOXETATE DISODIUM)[2019/15]
French:NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE COMPLEXE DE GADOLINIUM D'ACIDE (4S)-4-(4-ÉTHOXYBENZYL) -3,6,9-TRIS (CARBOXYLATOMÉTHYL)-3,6,9-TRIAZAUNDÉCANEDIOÏQUE DISODIQUE (GADOXATE DISODIQUE)[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase31.12.2018National basic fee paid 
31.12.2018Search fee paid 
31.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
31.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]CN104761461  (SHANDONG FUCHUANG PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 5-6, 7-9, 12 * . See claim 1, 2, examples. See claims, examples. * [A] 1-4, 10, 11;
 [YA]CN103420862  (QILU PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 5-6, 7-9, 12 * . See claim 1, 10, paragraph [0098] . See full document. * [A] 1-4, 10, 11;
 [YA]WO2011154333  (BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [Y] 5-6, 7-9, 12 * . See claim 1-6, paragraph [0014], examples. See abstract, claims, examples. * [A] 1-4, 10, 11;
 [A]CN103864630B  (UNIV FUZHOU) [A] 1-4, 5-6, 7- 9, 10, 11, 12 * . See abstract, claims. *;
 [A]CN101007775  [A] 1-4, 5-6, 7- 9, 10, 11, 12 * ; JIANGSU INST OF NUCLEAR MED (CN). See claims, examples. *