Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466725

EP3466725 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Nobuyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17806078.617.02.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP05932
Priority number, dateJP2016011220403.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016112204
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208516
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466725
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/03, B60C11/12, B60C11/11
[2019/22]
Former International [2019/15]B60C11/03, B60C11/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN[2019/15]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE[2019/15]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018Translation filed 
12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014238568  (HAGA TAKAFUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0033] , [0037]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]EP2151334  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JP2008155817  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * figure -; claim - *
International search[A]JP2015147484  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0049]; fig. 2 & US 2016/0347125 A1 paragraphs [0022] to [0051]; fig. 2 & WO 2015/118786 A1 & EP 3103657 A1 & KR 10-2016-0051873 A & CN 105916704 A *;
 [A]JP2007326433  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0036]; fig. 1, 3 & US 2007/0284026 A1 paragraphs [0013] to [0040]; fig. 1, 3 & EP 1864830 A2 & DE 602007004258 D *;
 [A]JPH10305713  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 2 to 3 & US 6220844 B1 fig. 2a to 3d & EP 876889 A2 *;
 [A]JPH03178808  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 1, 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2012018081  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 6, 7 & US 2013/0133798 A1 fig. 6, 7 & JP 5690339 B2 & EP 2602127 A1 & CN 103052514 A *;
 [A]WO2015193805  (PIRELLI [IT]) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 3 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015074360
 JP20160112204