Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467453

EP3467453 - LIQUID SENSOR AND TUBE HOLDING MEMBER OF LIQUID SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Industrial Devices SUNX Co., Ltd.
2431-1, Ushiyama-cho
Kasugai-shi
Aichi 486-0901 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYASHI Kazuhiko
c/o Panasonic Industrial Devices SUNX Co. Ltd.
2431-1 Ushiyama-cho
Kasugai-shi Aichi 486-0901 / JP
02 / TERAZAWA Takumi
c/o Panasonic Industrial Devices SUNX Co. Ltd.
2431-1 Ushiyama-cho
Kasugai-shi Aichi 486-0901 / JP
03 / KITANAKA Hironao
c/o Panasonic Industrial Devices SUNX Co. Ltd.
2431-1 Ushiyama-cho
Kasugai-shi Aichi 486-0901 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Daub, Thomas
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub
Bahnhofstrasse 5
88662 Überlingen / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806221.220.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP15914
Priority number, dateJP2016010847931.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016108479
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208661
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467453
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/292
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSSENSOR UND ROHRHALTEELEMENT DES FLÜSSIGKEITSSENSORS[2019/15]
English:LIQUID SENSOR AND TUBE HOLDING MEMBER OF LIQUID SENSOR[2019/15]
French:CAPTEUR DE LIQUIDE ET ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE DE TUBE DE CAPTEUR DE LIQUIDE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2018Translation filed 
02.10.2018National basic fee paid 
02.10.2018Search fee paid 
02.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH08293234  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0023]; fig. 1 to 3, 8 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012063328  (WELCO CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0066]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]EP1722204  (RANCILIO MACCHINE CAFFE [IT]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015137908