Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3467453


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
29.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
11.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2018 Change - representative
02.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication