blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3467453
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019120681Global Dossier 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
JP2016108479 31.05.2016
WO2017JP15914 20.04.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3467453Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
JP2016108479 31.05.2016
WO2017JP15914 20.04.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN209230732U 09.08.2019U
Priority number Date
JP2016108479 31.05.2016
WO2017JP15914 20.04.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017208661Global Dossier 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
JP2016108479 31.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2017215183Global Dossier 07.12.2017A
Priority number Date
JP2016108479 31.05.2016