Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466698

EP3466698 - INKJET RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konica Minolta, Inc.
2-7-2, Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TOKIMATSU, Hiroyuki
c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC.
2-7-2 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-7015 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date17806334.312.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP17969
Priority number, dateJP2016011195703.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016111957
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208776
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466698
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/19, B41J2/14, B41J2/165, B41J2/17, B41J2/18, B41J2/175
[2019/29]
Former International [2019/15]B41J2/19, B41J2/14, B41J2/165, B41J2/17, B41J2/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:INKJET RECORDING DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT À JET D'ENCRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018Translation filed 
03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Search fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2826628  (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0066] , [0 69] , [ 121] , [ 125] , [ 126] , [ 135] , [ 138] , [ 147]; figure 7 *;
 [X]EP3000605  (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0064] , [ 165] , [ 167] , [ 182] , [ 187]; figure 15 *;
 [X]EP1905598  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0051] , [0 53] , [0 60] , [0 61] , [0 70] , [0 74]; figure 4; claim 24 *
International search[A]JP2015058581  (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008087465  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2008/0079791 A1 & EP 1905598 A2 & KR 2008/0030284 A & CN 101152798 A *;
 [A]JP2006088575  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009029111  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0002467 A1 & CN 101332714 A *;
 [A]JP2013067111  (SII PRINTEK INC) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS62261450  (CANON KK) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2010039486  (WOUTERS PAUL [BE], et al) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings & WO rN 2008/080895 A1 & EP 1938994 A1 & CN 101568438 A *;
 [A]US2006187278  (LANGFORD JEFFREY D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *